NY S04736 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4736D
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4736D
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duty to report incidents to 911 and the county district attorney's office.
Title
Relates to the duty to report incidents to 911 and the county district attorney's office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4736D |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4736C |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4736B |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4736A |
2017-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06830 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - print number 6830c