NY S04742 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New York State drivers licenses to indicate if the licensee is a registered sex offender under Megan's Law, the "Sex Offender Registration Act"; makes additional changes regarding registration obligations and distribution of information.
Title
Requires New York State drivers licenses to indicate if the licensee is a registered sex offender under Megan's Law, the "Sex Offender Registration Act"; makes additional changes regarding registration obligations and distribution of information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4742A |
2012-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |