NY S04748 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Title
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1241 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1858 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4748A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A05565 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to aging