NY S04750 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6939
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6939
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until three years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until three years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6939 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1284 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A06939 (Same As) 2013-07-12 - signed chap.120