NY S04752 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a certain portion of state route 20A the "Livingston County Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a certain portion of state route 20A the "Livingston County Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.464 |
2013-11-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.699 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7260 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1092 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07260 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4752