NY S04752 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain certification required for eligibility for the real property tax exemption for persons with disabilities and limited incomes.
Title
Relates to certain certification required for eligibility for the real property tax exemption for persons with disabilities and limited incomes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1293 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4752A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06615 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means