NY S04754 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for electronic court appearance in a criminal action, anywhere in the state, at the discretion of the court having jurisdiction of the defendant; provides that the defendant must, after consultation with counsel, consent on the record; provides that the chief administrator of the courts must first approve the use of such electronic appearance.
Title
Provides for electronic court appearance in a criminal action, anywhere in the state, at the discretion of the court having jurisdiction of the defendant; provides that the defendant must, after consultation with counsel, consent on the record; provides that the chief administrator of the courts must first approve the use of such electronic appearance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.811 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |