NY S04756 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - VETOED MEMO.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - VETOED MEMO.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Title
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.217 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.469 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6942 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06942 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s4756