NY S04756 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4756B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4756B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires private schools to provide to the commissioner of education copies of certain documents prior to receipt of apportionment funds or a Basis Educational Data System code.
Title
Requires private schools to provide to the commissioner of education copies of certain documents prior to receipt of apportionment funds or a Basis Educational Data System code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4756B |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4756A |
2017-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01542 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - print number 1542a