NY S04756 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that public buildings with multi-line telephone systems configure their system hardware in order to allow any call placed to 911, to be directly connected to a public service answering point.
Title
Requires that public buildings with multi-line telephone systems configure their system hardware in order to allow any call placed to 911, to be directly connected to a public service answering point.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.74 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.727 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.217 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | substituted for a458 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.473 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A00458 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.74