NY S04758 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Babylon to grant the mosque Ahmadiyya Movement In Islam, Inc. a property tax exemption after the filing deadline has passed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Babylon to grant the mosque Ahmadiyya Movement In Islam, Inc. a property tax exemption after the filing deadline has passed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.497
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a6659a
2019-06-06Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED 4758A
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.936
2019-03-22SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06659 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s4758a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback