NY S04769 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Plandome Manor to enter into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens; extends effectiveness of provisions.
Title
Authorizes the village of Plandome Manor to enter into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens; extends effectiveness of provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.519 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6771 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06771 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519