NY S04808 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - signed chap.748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - signed chap.748
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain insurance policies from requiring prior authorization for buprenorphine products, methadone and long acting injectable naltrexone for detoxification or maintenance treatment of substance use disorders.
Title
Prohibits certain insurance policies from requiring prior authorization for buprenorphine products, methadone and long acting injectable naltrexone for detoxification or maintenance treatment of substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Senate | signed chap.748 |
2019-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1142 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4808 |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.152 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2904 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1142 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02904 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - signed chap.748