NY S04809 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Title
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.164 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a4256a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED 4809A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.734 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A04256 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164