NY S04827 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "consumer credit fairness act"; establishes a 3 year statute of limitations for commencement of a cause of action arising out of a consumer credit transaction where the defendant is a purchaser, borrower or debtor; establishes a notice of lawsuit which must be mailed to the defendant in such a cause of action; establishes certain requirements for the complaint in such an action; provides for arbitration of such actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "consumer credit fairness act"; establishes a 3 year statute of limitations for commencement of a cause of action arising out of a consumer credit transaction where the defendant is a purchaser, borrower or debtor; establishes a notice of lawsuit which must be mailed to the defendant in such a cause of action; establishes certain requirements for the complaint in such an action; provides for arbitration of such actions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1771
2019-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 4827B
2019-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 4827A
2019-06-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-03-26SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A06909 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.596

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback