NY S04833 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "prospective relative guardian" for purposes of subsidized kinship guardianship assistance.
Title
Clarifies the definition of "prospective relative guardian" for purposes of subsidized kinship guardianship assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.384 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.468 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7554a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4833A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1550 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A07554 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s4833a