NY S04861 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the closure of nursing homes.
Title
Relates to the closure of nursing homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4861A |
2019-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00710 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES