NY S04865 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the uniform partition of heirs property act which supplements the general partition statute and governs actions to partition heirs property.
Title
Establishes the uniform partition of heirs property act which supplements the general partition statute and governs actions to partition heirs property.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.596 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.599 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7058a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1691 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4865A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07058 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596