NY S04876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the preparation of recommendations for best practices in treating livestock and farm property for Asian longhorned tick treatment, prevention and management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the preparation of recommendations for best practices in treating livestock and farm property for Asian longhorned tick treatment, prevention and management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.425
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a8098
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4876A
2019-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1143
2019-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-28SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A04773 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - referred to environmental conservation
A08098 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4876a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04876
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04876A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4876#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4876#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4876#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback