NY S04888 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the publication of information regarding awards of state contracts.
Title
Relates to the publication of information regarding awards of state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.448 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.592 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4888 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2019-03-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.71 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to small business |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2166 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.592 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02166 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.448