NY S04899 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units and requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal; establishes that occupancies of a short-term rental unit shall be subject to taxes and fees pursuant to articles twenty-eight and twenty-nine of the tax law and applicable local laws.
Title
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units and requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal; establishes that occupancies of a short-term rental unit shall be subject to taxes and fees pursuant to articles twenty-eight and twenty-nine of the tax law and applicable local laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4899B |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4899A |
2019-04-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06392 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing