NY S04901 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public educational institutions.
Title
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.116 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.364 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4901 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.30 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | rules report cal.30 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3425 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.364 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03425 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - signed chap.116