NY S04909 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.363
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.363
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to method of collection of charges by the Suffolk county water authority.
Title
Relates to method of collection of charges by the Suffolk county water authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.363 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.492 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7571b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4909B |
2016-03-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4909A |
2016-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07571 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4909b