NY S04915 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Nichols, county of Tioga, on state route seventeen between exits sixty-two and sixty-three as the "Dennis 'Matt' Howe Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Nichols, county of Tioga, on state route seventeen between exits sixty-two and sixty-three as the "Dennis 'Matt' Howe Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09AssemblySIGNED CHAP.158
2019-08-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.290
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a7696a
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1384
2019-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 4915A
2019-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-29SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07696 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4915a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback