NY S04916 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants James G. Lynch retirement from the New York state and local employees' retirement system on June 10, 2016.
Title
Grants James G. Lynch retirement from the New York state and local employees' retirement system on June 10, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.822 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08158 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental employees