NY S04927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4927B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that photographs of all parking violations be taken and maintained; and requires that such photographs be furnished to the person charged in a reasonable time upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that photographs of all parking violations be taken and maintained; and requires that such photographs be furnished to the person charged in a reasonable time upon request.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 4927B
2019-06-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 4927A
2019-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-29SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07401 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - print number 7401a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback