NY S04945 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the registration of certain farm vehicles.
Title
Relates to the registration of certain farm vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.500 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1077 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4945 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.135 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | print number 3860a |
2019-03-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3860A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1077 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03860 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.500