NY S04947 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires healthcare and wellness education and outreach on the donation of postnatal tissue and fluids.
Title
Requires healthcare and wellness education and outreach on the donation of postnatal tissue and fluids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.381 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.381 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A04143 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means