NY S04970 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires instruction in financial management for all students in grades four through eight.
Title
Requires instruction in financial management for all students in grades four through eight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4970B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4970A |
2019-04-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04772 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education