NY S04972 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments for home and community based long term care services; provides that funds appropriated to compensate for minimum wage requirements, shall not be subject to managed care risk adjustment on insurers.
Title
Relates to payments for home and community based long term care services; provides that funds appropriated to compensate for minimum wage requirements, shall not be subject to managed care risk adjustment on insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.308 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4972A |
2020-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1322 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02788 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means