NY S04975 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the administration of vaccines for hepatitis A, hepatitis B, and human papillomavirus by a licensed pharmacist and by a certified nurse practitioner.
Title
Authorizes the administration of vaccines for hepatitis A, hepatitis B, and human papillomavirus by a licensed pharmacist and by a certified nurse practitioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1038 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06846 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education