NY S05002 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Title
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02177 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES