NY S05052 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from certain provisions of the administrative code of the City of New York relating to property tax benefits for multiple dwellings, certain multiple dwellings in the Bronx.
Title
Exempts from certain provisions of the administrative code of the City of New York relating to property tax benefits for multiple dwellings, certain multiple dwellings in the Bronx.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 5052A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1025 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07322 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to real property taxation