NY S05064 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to accept premium and cost sharing payments from third parties.
Title
Requires health insurers to accept premium and cost sharing payments from third parties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |