NY S05069 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of civil service to study and publish a report evaluating public employers' wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender and race/ethnicity identification of the employees in the title.
Title
Directs the department of civil service to study and publish a report evaluating public employers' wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender and race/ethnicity identification of the employees in the title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.637 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.308 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7125 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.399 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07125 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.637