NY S05072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08AssemblySIGNED CHAP.91
2019-07-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-22Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.63
2019-05-22Assemblysubstituted for a7194a
2019-05-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-03SenateAMENDED 5072A
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.520
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A07194 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - substituted by s5072a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback