NY S05073 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a school voter registration access program to promote student voter registration and pre-registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a school voter registration access program to promote student voter registration and pre-registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.152
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1772
2019-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 5073A
2019-06-12SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08717 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback