NY S05092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain pharmacists as qualified health care professionals and authorizes such pharmacists to complete a waived test and directs the commissioner of health to establish a list of CLIA-waived tests.
Title
Includes certain pharmacists as qualified health care professionals and authorizes such pharmacists to complete a waived test and directs the commissioner of health to establish a list of CLIA-waived tests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.265 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.839 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03867 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education