NY S05098 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental conservation to designate certain species as vulnerable species and prohibits the sale of articles made from any part of a vulnerable species; and requires the department to designate the giraffe as a vulnerable species.
Title
Requires the department of environmental conservation to designate certain species as vulnerable species and prohibits the sale of articles made from any part of a vulnerable species; and requires the department to designate the giraffe as a vulnerable species.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.42 |
2019-12-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.651 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.209 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | substituted for a6600 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.489 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06600 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.42