NY S05112 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.159
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.159
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "SSgt Louis Bonacasa Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "SSgt Louis Bonacasa Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.159 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.390 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7296a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 5112A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1078 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07296 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.159