NY S05118 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.17
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.459
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-02-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-02-12Assemblyordered to third reading cal.639
2018-02-12Assemblysubstituted for a6990a
2018-01-23Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-01-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.162
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2017-06-07AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-05-22SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5118B
2017-05-16SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5118A
2017-05-16SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-16Senatereturned to senate
2017-05-16AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-05-01Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2017-05-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-04-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-25Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.565
2017-03-08SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06990 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s5118b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05118&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05118&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05118
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05118&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05118A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05118&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05118B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5118#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5118#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5118#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5118#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5118#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05118&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback