NY S05121 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notices to be posted in facilities licensed, certified or operated, by the office of mental health.
Title
Relates to notices to be posted in facilities licensed, certified or operated, by the office of mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.535 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1324 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5121A |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Senate | amended on third reading 1370c |
2019-05-14 | Senate | amended on third reading 1370b |
2019-04-25 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.178 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | print number 1370a |
2019-03-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1370C |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1324 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5121A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01370 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.535