NY S05122 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of a municipality or governmental subdivision for the refund of property taxes to the Long Island power authority.
Title
Relates to the liability of a municipality or governmental subdivision for the refund of property taxes to the Long Island power authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.332 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.530 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5122A |
2019-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07786 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions