NY S05125 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits class A multiple dwellings from requiring the use of a smart access system for means of entry for building entrances, common areas, elevators, garage gates, or apartment entry doors; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Title
Prohibits class A multiple dwellings from requiring the use of a smart access system for means of entry for building entrances, common areas, elevators, garage gates, or apartment entry doors; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5125B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5125A |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06788 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes