NY S05127 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5127A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5127A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.
Title
Relates to the licensure of athletic trainers; adds athletic trainers to the list of persons and officials required to report cases of suspected child abuse or maltreatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5127A |
2020-07-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05499 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - print number 5499b