NY S05133 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.274 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.449 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a5324 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.751 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05324 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.274