NY S05144 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the closure of hospitals; includes general hospitals, emergency or maternity departments or the surrender of an operating certificate.
Title
Relates to the closure of hospitals; includes general hospitals, emergency or maternity departments or the surrender of an operating certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5144A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02986 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health