NY S05148 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits campaign contributions to candidates for state senate and assembly by certain members of the legislative ethics commission; provides an exemption that permits present members of the legislature to make campaign contributions; imposes penalties.
Title
Prohibits campaign contributions to candidates for state senate and assembly by certain members of the legislative ethics commission; provides an exemption that permits present members of the legislature to make campaign contributions; imposes penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.319 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.636 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5148A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10242 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - referred to election law