NY S05150 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that with the first opioid prescription of each year for use in a setting other than a general hospital or nursing home under article twenty-eight of this chapter or facility under article thirty-one of the mental hygiene law, or when a practitioner is prescribing a controlled substance to a patient under the care of hospice, the prescriber shall prescribe an opioid antagonist when any of the following risk factors are present: a history of substance abuse disorder; high dose or cumulative prescriptions that result in over 50 morphine milligram equivalents per day; concurrent use of opioids and benzodiazepine or nonbenzodiazepine sedative hypnotics.
Title
Provides that with the first opioid prescription of each year for use in a setting other than a general hospital or nursing home under article twenty-eight of this chapter or facility under article thirty-one of the mental hygiene law, or when a practitioner is prescribing a controlled substance to a patient under the care of hospice, the prescriber shall prescribe an opioid antagonist when any of the following risk factors are present: a history of substance abuse disorder; high dose or cumulative prescriptions that result in over 50 morphine milligram equivalents per day; concurrent use of opioids and benzodiazepine or nonbenzodiazepine sedative hypnotics.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.331 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1773 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5150B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5150A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05603 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means