NY S05152 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | vetoed memo.126 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1606 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5152 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.544 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7228 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1606 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07228 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - tabled